Nettet22. feb. 2011 · John Thompson’ Profile Born April 24, 1949, in Fort Dix, NJ, John W. Thompson, enjoyed a 28-year career with IBM, ending up GM of Americas before becoming CEO of Symantec. He is presently the chairman of Symantec and CEO of Virtual Instruments since June 2010.
Did you know?
NettetJohn W Thompson is Chief Legal Counsel/General Counsel at Ameri Metro Inc. See John W Thompson's compensation, career history, education, & memberships. NettetChief executive officer John W. Thompson was born on April 24, 1949 to Eunice Walden and John H. Thompson in Fort Dix, New Jersey. He was raised in West Palm Beach, Florida where he graduated from John F. Kennedy High School in 1967. He briefly attended Lincoln University on a music scholarship before transferring to Florida A&M …
NettetJohn W. Thompson is on the board of Points.com, Inc. In his past career Mr. Thompson held the position of Member-Governors Board at Roy Thomson Hall, Member-Governing Council at The Sunnybrook Foundation, Member-Governors Board at Massey Hall, Executive Vice President for Loblaw Cos. Ltd. and Managing Director at Kensington … NettetAug 2004 - Present18 years 7 months. Reston, Virginia. EHD Design Build Group is a comprehensive property solutions firm providing Design/Build, MEP Services, and Exterior Living services to the ...
NettetJohn W. Thompson. John W. Thompson joined the Microsoft board in February 2012, and became independent board chair of Microsoft Corp. on Feb. 4, 2014. Thompson brings over 40 years of experience in the technology industry. Most recently, he served as chief executive officer of Virtual Instruments, a privately held company. Before this, he … NettetJohn W Thompson is Judge at Arizona Court of Appeals. See John W Thompson's compensation, career history, education, & memberships.
NettetThompson, John William was born on October 14, 1945 in Hurricane, Utah, United States. Son of Thomas Thurman and Lula (Brinkerhoff) Thompson. Education Bachelor of Science in Electrical Engineering, Utah State University, 1969. Master of Business Administration, Utah State University, 1972. Doctor of Philosophy, University Oregon, …
Nettet28. sep. 2016 · John W. has 6 jobs listed on their profile. See the complete profile on LinkedIn and discover John W.’s connections and … coventry auto sales coventry ctNettetView John W Thompson’s profile on LinkedIn, the world’s largest professional community. John W has 2 jobs listed on their profile. See the complete profile on LinkedIn and discover John W’S ... briars mornington peninsulaNettet16. jun. 2012 · John W. Thompson, CEO of Virtual Instruments. I stayed 28 years and rose to general manager of I.B.M. Americas. I had no interest in leaving, but the odds were low that I’d ever be C.E.O. When a ... coventry auto solutionsNettet18. des. 2024 · During his career at IBM, Thompson held the roles of branch manager, assistant to the regional manager, regional marketing director, assistant to the chief executive officer and chairman, director of IBM’s Midwest operations, and general manager of personal software products. briars of sin elden ring locationNettetBiography. Hon. John W. Thompson, Jr. (Ret.) was a judge for the York County Court of Common Pleas in Pennsylvania. He was elected to the bench in 1997. Thompson retired in May 2015. During his judicial tenure, he held an assignment in the Family Court. Thompson received a B.A. from the University of Pittsburgh in 1968. briars nursery lightwaterNettet12. apr. 2024 · 43 min ago. CARNEGIE — John Edward Thompson was born in Carnegie, OK, on April 2, 1942, to John D. and Mary O. Thompson. John passed away on April 9, 2024, at the age of 81. John grew up in Mountain View, OK, and graduated from Sedan High School in 1960. He attended Oklahoma State University where is … briars preschoolNettetThompson, John Jack W. was born on August 10, 1932 in Staten Island, New York, ... Master of Arts in Political Science, University Connecticut, 1969. Career Faculty Bacon Academy, Colchester, Connecticut, 1958—1959. Executive director Connecticut State Employees Association, 1958—1978. Owner John W. Thompson Associate, since 1978. briars natchez ms